CA AB1389 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2814.1 of, and to add Section 2814.3 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: sobriety checkpoints: impoundment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1389 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1389 Allen By Evans (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1389 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1389 Allen By Evans (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1389 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 3139.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 19. Page 2396.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-27 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1585.) | |
2011-05-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2814.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2814.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 2814.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |