CA AB1385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 69950 and 69951 of, and to add and repeal Section 69950.5 of, the Government Code, relating to court reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court reporter fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1385 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1888.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code69950Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code69950.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code69951Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback