CA AB1384 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13963.1 of, and to add Section 13963.2 to, the Government Code, relating to victims of violent crimes.
Title
Victims of violent crimes: trauma recovery centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1384 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1384 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1384 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1384 Weber et al. By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1384 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3120.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2516.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 2052.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13963.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13963.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13963.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |