CA AB1383 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12940 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 12958) to Chapter 6 of Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' preferences: voluntary policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-21 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1383 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2016-06-21SenateIn committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2016-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-05-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-07-14SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-07-02SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1814.)
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12958New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1383&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20150528_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20150619_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20160504_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20160613_amended_sen_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20150422_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20150602_0344PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20160621_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20160621_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback