CA AB1379 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4467 of the Government Code, relating to disability access, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified access specialist program: funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1379 Thurmond By Jackson (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1379 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2477.).
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 21).
2017-07-20SenateMeasure version as amended on March 30 corrected.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 2045.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code4459.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4467Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback