CA AB1377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 18901.56 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalFresh.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1377 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB1377 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1377 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1887.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11Assembly(pending re-referral to Com. on ED.)
2019-04-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.)
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49557.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18901.56New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback