CA AB1376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 716 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: security clearances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code716New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback