CA AB1375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 16009 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care: placements: database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1375 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1987.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16009New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16010.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback