CA AB1372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1101, 1127, 1154, 1156, 1156.5, 1157.5, 1170.1, 1190, 1190.1, and 1191 of, to add Section 1190.2 to, and to repeal and add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1200) to Division 5 of, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilots, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Bar pilots: pilotage rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1372 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1156.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1157.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1170.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1190.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 1191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |