CA AB1372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14724 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crisis stabilization units: psychiatric patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1372 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14724New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback