CA AB1370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23039 of, and to add Section 24045.78 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage licenses: nonprofit arts foundation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1370 Chiu By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1370 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23039Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code24045.78New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback