CA AB137 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 19821.1 of, and to add and repeal Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 7086) of Chapter 9 of Division 3 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 24000, 24001, 24002, and 100007 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 6103.8, 11549.3, 13332.19, 27361, 27361.2, 27361.4, 27361.8, and 27388 of, to add Sections 7902.2 and 11546.45 to, to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 12100.110) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to add and repeal Section 8260 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 11165.1 of, and to add Chapter 1.6 (commencing with Section 24210) to Division 20 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 880 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 3502, 3503, and 3505 of, and to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 10198) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, to add Section 25403.2 to, and to add and repeal Section 25208 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 1601 and 1615 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 1604 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 4514 and 5328 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 137 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB137 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 137 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB137 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 137 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2197.). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2192.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2192.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1755.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 480.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |