CA AB137 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8720 of, to add Section 8540 to, and to repeal and add Section 8712 of, the Water Code, relating to flood control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilities of the State Plan of Flood Control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 137 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Noes: (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-18SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-03-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 3. Page 915.)
2019-03-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 19).
2019-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2018-12-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code8540New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code8720Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback