CA AB1369 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 837, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2052.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-state physicians and surgeons: telehealth: license exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1369 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1369 Bauer-Kahan By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1369 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 837, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3067.).
2023-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
2023-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2429.).
2023-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-31SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.)
2023-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2023-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2052.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback