CA AB1368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 124037 and 125186 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 14133.91 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health professionals.
Title
Health professionals: authorization forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1368 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1368 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1271.) |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123823 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124037 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 125186 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |