CA AB1362 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2021.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to pest abatement.
Title
San Mateo County Mosquito and Vector Control District: board of trustees: appointment of members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1362 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1362 Gordon By Leno (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1362 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1362 Gordon By Leno (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1362 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 10. Page 6214.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 5106.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 3497.) |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3439.) |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 2021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 2021.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |