CA AB1361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8265.2 and 8265.5 of, to add Article 8.6 (commencing with Section 8248) to Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Section 8272.2 to, and to repeal Section 8239.1 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 1596.893c of, and to add Section 1596.7997 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare and developmental services: preschool: expulsion and suspension: mental health services: reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 28). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8239.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8248 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8265.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8265.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.7997 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.893 | Amended Code | Citation Text |