CA AB1361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71611.5 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Municipal water districts: water service: Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1361 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1361 Eduardo Garcia By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1361 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1361 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1361 Eduardo Garcia By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1361 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1361 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3503.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 14). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2784.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2458.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1944.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1012.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 236.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 71611.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |