CA AB1360 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-01 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-01 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 273.5 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: corporal injury.
Sponsors
Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Asm. John Perez [D] | Asm. Alberto Torrico [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1360 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2026.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1941.). (Corrected September 3.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |