CA AB136 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14669.22 and 95020 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1502, 1507.2, 1524, 1534, 1538, 1538.55, 1548, and 1566.45 of, to amend the heading of Article 9 (commencing with Section 1567.50) of Chapter 3 of Division 2 of, and to add Sections 1507.35 and 1567.51 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 361.2, 727, 4418.7, 4474.17, 4512, 4519.5, 4640.6, 4643.5, 4646, 4684.50, 4684.53, 4684.55, 4684.58, 4684.60, 4684.63, 4684.65, 4684.68, 4684.70, 4684.73, 4684.74, 4685.8, 4691.12, 4870, 6500, 6502, 6509, 7505, 11402, 17731, 17732, and 17736 of, to amend the heading of Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 4684.50) of Chapter 6 of Division 4.5 of, to amend and repeal Section 4648.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4519 of, to add Sections 4511.1, 4511.5, 4519.9, 4519.10, 4620.4, 4620.5, 4641.1, 4684.76, 4684.77, 4685.9, 4870.1, and 19726 to, to repeal Section 4692 of, and to repeal and add Section 7500 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 136 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB136 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 136 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB136 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 136 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2203.). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2202.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2202.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1760.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 479.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |