CA AB1353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1367.245 and 1367.246 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10123.203 and 10123.204 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: prescription drugs: continuity of care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.246 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1353 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1353 |