CA AB1352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5604, 5604.2, 5604.3, 5604.5, and 5848 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Community mental health services: mental health boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1352 Waldron Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1352 Waldron By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1352 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1352 Waldron By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1352 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3112.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2503.). |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5604.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5604.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5604.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |