CA AB1352 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1203.43 to the Penal Code, relating to deferred entry of judgment.
Title
Deferred entry of judgment: withdrawal of plea.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1352 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 43 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1352 Eggman By Lara (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1352 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1352 Eggman By Lara (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1352 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3169.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 3174.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2742.). |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2647.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 1257.) |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |