CA AB1351 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11370.4 and 11372 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: fentanyl.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11370.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11372Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback