CA AB1351 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 525, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 525, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 399.12.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1351 BLAKESLEE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1351 Blakeslee By Aanestad (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1351 BLAKESLEE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1351 Blakeslee By Aanestad (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1351 BLAKESLEE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 525, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3180.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2166.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1768.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |