CA AB1350 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal and add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1300) of Division 6 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: memorials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1350 Soria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent AB1350 Soria (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1350 Soria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2023-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3454.).
2023-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2023-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2689.).
2023-09-08SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-14SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1771.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1300New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback