CA AB1350 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 101852, 101852.1, 101853, 101853.1, 101855, 101855.1, and 101856 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospital authorities.
Title
Kern County Hospital Authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1350 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1350 Salas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1350 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1350 Salas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1350 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2562.). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1442.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 101852 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101852.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101853.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101855.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101856 | Amended Code | Citation Text |