CA AB1349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Hearing: Jun 14 in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 281 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Advanced Services Fund: Broadband Adoption Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1349 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
2021-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and JUD.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code281Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback