CA AB1348 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 1 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 124244 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to youth athletics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth athletics: chronic traumatic encephalopathy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - AB 1348 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 1).
2022-05-04SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2022-01-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2022-01-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2022-01-10AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2022-01-10AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2022-01-06AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member McCarty.
2021-06-02AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code124244Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback