CA AB1346 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 43018.11 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air pollution: small off-road engines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1346 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1346 Berman et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1346 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Set, [First] hearing. Referred to suspense file (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 22.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 9.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code43018.11New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback