CA AB1346 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 1346 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - AB 1346 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3526.) |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8570.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8587.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |