CA AB1345 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21006 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Franchise Tax Board: administration: report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1345 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 21006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |