CA AB1343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 94918.5 to the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private postsecondary education: California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1343 Eggman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 1800.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code94918.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback