CA AB1340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 94892.6) to Chapter 8 of Part 59 of Division 10 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to private postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private postsecondary education: California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009: labor market outcome data reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1340 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1340 Chiu et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1340 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 1800.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code94885Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code94892.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code94897.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback