CA AB1340 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 35400 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2016-01-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-01-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2016-01-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code37420.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code10051.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code35400Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback