CA AB1340 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1265.9 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4100 and 7200 of, and to add Sections 4143, 4144, and 4145 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhanced treatment programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1340 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1340 Achadjian By Beall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1340 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6534.).
2014-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2014-08-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2014-08-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4710.).
2014-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2014-06-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2014-04-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1826.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1340&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20130410_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140403_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140616_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140702_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140820_amended_sen_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140903_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20140928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20130416_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20130430_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20130530_0321PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140611_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140821_0256PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140826_000005_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20140827_1103AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback