CA AB1339 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12958 to the Government Code, relating to discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination: disability: medication-assisted treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2023-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2023-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12958New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback