CA AB1337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.3 (commencing with Section 44735) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teaching as a Priority Block Grant program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44735New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback