CA AB1333 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.95 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification: Susanville Indian Rancheria.
Sponsors
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1333 Dahle By Dahle Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1333 Dahle Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1333 Dahle Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2290.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2723.). |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96(b) suspended. (Page 2541.) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |