CA AB1332 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 17.23 (commencing with Section 7283.50) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctuary State Contracting and Investment Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7283.50New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback