CA AB1330 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage tied-house restrictions: exceptions: County of Riverside.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1330 Mayes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1330 Mayes et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1330 Frazier Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1330 Mayes et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1330 Frazier Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4881.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate Rule 26 invoked. (Mayes). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kamlager. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1252.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |