CA AB1328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1206, 1206.5, 1206.6, 1265, 4050, 4052, 4052.2, and 4052.4 of, and to add Section 1206.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Clinical laboratory technology and pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1328 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1328 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1406.) |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1206.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1206.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |