CA AB1328 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6086.7 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 1424.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: withholding of evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1328 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1328 Weber By Leno (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1328 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1328 Weber By Leno (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1328 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 3157.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2713.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 36. Page 1703.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 14). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6086.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1424.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |