CA AB1326 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 107 of the Corporations Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 2003 of, and to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 26000) to, the Financial Code, relating to digital currency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital currency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1326 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2016-08-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2016-08-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-08SenateFrom inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2015-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
2015-08-24SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-08-19SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-08-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2015-07-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and PUB. S.
2015-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1879.)
2015-06-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2015-05-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code107Repealed CodeCitation Text
Financial Code2003New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code2178New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code26000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1326&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20150601_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20150706_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20150818_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_bill_20160808_amended_sen_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_vote_20150427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_vote_20150603_0357PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_vote_20150824_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1326_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback