CA AB1326 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 6376.6, 17053.83, and 23623.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: exemptions: unmanned aerial vehicle manufacturing: income taxes: credits: hiring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
2013-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2013-04-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback