CA AB1326 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 99500) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to add Part 21 (commencing with Section 42001) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to postsecondary education, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Higher Education Endowment Corporation: oil
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Warren Furutani [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Higher Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Higher Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED and REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-03-23 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 99500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42001 | New Code | See Bill Text |