CA AB1325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 40220.7 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle parking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking penalties: community service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyMeasure version as amended on March 26 corrected.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code40220.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback