CA AB1320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16642 of, and to add and repeal Section 7513.74 of, the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee retirement systems: prohibited investments: Turkey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1320 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 1886.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 3).
2019-03-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code16642Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7513.74Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback