CA AB1319 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14005.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal benefits: share of cost requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1319 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-08-27SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-29SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1728.)
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback