CA AB1319 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 286, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal and add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 1701) of Part 6 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to talent services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talent services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1319 KREKORIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1319 Krekorian By Leno (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1319 KREKORIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1319 KREKORIAN Assembly Third Reading Amend By KREKORIAN Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 286, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-29 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2009-09-08 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3103.)
2009-09-03 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-09-02 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2108.)
2009-08-31 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-27 Read third time, amended. To second reading.
2009-08-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-18 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-08-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-14 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-13 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8).
2009-07-02 Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2009-06-28 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-26 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
2009-06-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-06-11 Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
2009-06-02 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-01 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 1863.)
2009-05-26 Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 1667.). (Corrected May 26.)
2009-05-18 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 13).
2009-04-28 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 28).
2009-04-23 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22).
2009-04-16 Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2009-04-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 22.)
2009-04-02 Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1319&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090415_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090526_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090615_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090628_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090714_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090817_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090827_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20090910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090422_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090526_1251PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090601_0240PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090623_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090708_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090902_1141AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1319_vote_20090908_0457PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback